U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00949
  • Case Name: Rushing v. Harvanek
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 12, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • December 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 06, 2022: [Receipt]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 03, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • November 03, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.