U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00954
  • Case Name: Camargo v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 17, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.