U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00956
  • Case Name: Hemp Hydrate Brands Corporation v. Private Label Supplements Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 19, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • November 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 04, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.