U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00950
  • Case Name: Bajema et al v. American Economy Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.