U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00958
  • Case Name: Blankenship et al v. Stitt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.