U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00963
  • Case Name: Ingram v. 7-Eleven Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 01, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Receipt]
  • November 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 08, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • November 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.