U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00965
  • Case Name: Kimble v. Russell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 09, 2023: [Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 08, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • November 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.