U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00962
  • Case Name: Calloway v. Cava
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 13, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 15, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.