U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00968
  • Case Name: Herrera v. Ovsepyan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2023: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • November 10, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 09, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • November 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.