U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00973
  • Case Name: Cuellar v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Costs Taxed]
December, 2022
  • December 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • November 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.