U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00970
  • Case Name: Childress v. Sangre Foodservice Management LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.