U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00977
  • Case Name: Humphrey Insurance and Financial Services Inc et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • December 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.