U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00981
  • Case Name: Sooner Dynamics LLC v. Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Receipt]
  • November 14, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.