U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00982
  • Case Name: Phillips et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 16, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Discovery]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 12, 2022: [Remand]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.