U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00986
  • Case Name: Colton et al v. Sandridge Exploration and Production LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Docket]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 28, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • November 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.