U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00984
  • Case Name: Allen v. Zurich American Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Joint Status Report]
  • January 06, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 16, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 15, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.