U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00985
  • Case Name: Pendergraft v. Oklahoma Attorney General's Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • January 12, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 20, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Receipt]
  • November 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.