U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00978
  • Case Name: Farrell v. Breidenstein et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Receipt]
  • January 04, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • December 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 01, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 15, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • November 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.