U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00991
  • Case Name: Anderson et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.