U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00998
  • Case Name: Elite Force Building Solutions LLC v. Quadrant Constructions LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • December 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • November 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 22, 2022: [Receipt]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.