U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01000
  • Case Name: Christian v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 02, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 02, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 01, 2022: [Receipt]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 22, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.