U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01001
  • Case Name: DeMarcus v. Town of Apache et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.