U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01003
  • Case Name: Kimbro v. Oklahoma House of Representatives
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 23, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.