U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Kelly et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 07, 2025: [Witness List]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 17, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.