U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01014
  • Case Name: Goins v. GEO Lawton Correctional Facility et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 13, 2023: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • January 04, 2023: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 30, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • November 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.