U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01017
  • Case Name: Ford v. Robeck et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • December 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 30, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.