U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-01314
  • Case Name: Kalbaugh v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • December 05, 2022: [Objections]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.