U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01024
  • Case Name: Pennaco Natural Resources LLC v. Coterra Energy Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 14, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.