U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01021
  • Case Name: Horsey v. Ranks
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Brief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 05, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • December 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.