U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01026
  • Case Name: Denton v. Walmart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • December 06, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.