U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01027
  • Case Name: Cooper v. Oklahoma County Criminal Justice Authority et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 06, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • December 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.