U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01028
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Qualgen LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.