U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01040
  • Case Name: Baker v. Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 13, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.