U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01045
  • Case Name: AGC FLat Glass North America Inc v. UFP Eastern Division Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • January 09, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 05, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 03, 2023: [Disclosure]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.