U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01048
  • Case Name: Gonsalves v. Rankins
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order for Response]
  • January 06, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Receipt]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 12, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • December 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 12, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.