U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01051
  • Case Name: Balfour v. Griswold et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 27, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • December 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.