U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01053
  • Case Name: Osborne-Franklin v. Board of County Commissioners of Cleveland County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 24, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 10, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 03, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2023: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Supplement]
  • December 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.