U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01062
  • Case Name: Hodnik v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • December 16, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 16, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.