U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01069
  • Case Name: Cadelrock III LLC v. Wheeler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 10, 2024: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.