U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00532-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swallow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Violation Report - Post Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision and Order (12C)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Rule 32.1 Documents Received]
  • March 21, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 20, 2022: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.