U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01076
  • Case Name: Pitts v. LNU
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 20, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • December 20, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.