U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01096
  • Case Name: Pro Walk Manufacturing Company Inc v. Lewis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Declaration]
  • January 11, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order for Response]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Declaration]
  • January 03, 2023: [Temporary Restraining Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.