U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01103
  • Case Name: Crabbs et al v. Engie North America Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • January 06, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 06, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order for Response]
  • January 04, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.