U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:06-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Leathers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 02, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 02, 2025: [Detention]
  • May 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision and Order (12C)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Request for Modifying Conditions of Supervision (12B)]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Request for Modifying Conditions of Supervision (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.