U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Jarrell et al v. Haaji et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Supplement]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Jury Demand]
  • January 18, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 16, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2023: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 11, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.