U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Price v. MHM Support Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Extension of Time]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Jury Demand]
  • January 19, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2023: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.