U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 04, 2024: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 18, 2023: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.