U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00342-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • May 01, 2025: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • May 01, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 18, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 09, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 08, 2025: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 01, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 25, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [USCA Order - without Notice of Appeal]
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.