U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00373-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Truong
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Downward Departure]
  • April 22, 2025: [Acceptance of Responsibility Downward Adjustment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Seal Document]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2024: [Docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.