U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00284-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vazquez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Information - Felony]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Combined Plea and Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Docket]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Docket]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.